FL H7021 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends duration of liability protections from COVID-19-related claims against health care providers.
Title
Covid-19-related Claims Against Health Care Providers
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | Sen. Colleen Burton [R] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] | Rep. Patt Maney [R] |
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7014 |
2022-02-09 | House | Substituted SB 7014 |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-14 | House | Filed |