FL H7021 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that contractual relationships held by business entities are deemed held by public officers or employees in certain situations; requiring certain ethics training for governing board members of special districts and water management districts; prohibiting governing board members of special districts or school districts from voting in an official capacity on specified matters; requiring certain mayors and members of a municipality governing body to file a full and public disclosure of financial interests; providing for the future repeal of provisions relating to registration and reporting for lobbying water management districts; requiring the commission to create the Local Government Lobbyist Registration System; requiring lobbyists to register with the commission before lobbying governmental entities effective a specified date; providing civil penalties, etc.
Title
Local Government Ethics Reform
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Public Integrity and Ethics Committee | Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-30 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (441225) |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/17 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-22 | House | CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 03/22/17, 9:15 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-08 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/08/17, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7023 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 32612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
99 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |