FL H7021 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Florida Employee Long-Term-Care Plan Act & provisions relating to health insurance for retirees under FRS, authority of DMS to initiate & supervise group insurance program for active members of FHP Auxiliary, & participation by correctional work programs nonprofit corporation in state group health insurance & prescription drug programs.
Title
Government-Sponsored Health Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Holder [R] | Rep. Mike Horner [R] | Rep. Carlos Lopez-Cantera [R] | Rep. Seth McKeel [R] |
Rep. Peter Nehr [R] | Rep. Marlene O'Toole [R] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] | Rep. Lake Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0599 - Passage (Y: 74 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-03-23 | In Messages | |
2010-03-18 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00328; Passed; YEAS 74 NAYS 40 -HJ 00328 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00296 | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 -HJ 00218; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00218 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00148; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-01 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0110 | 1227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0110 | 1234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 0804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0946 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |