FL H7009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Chapter No. 2022-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Chapter No. 2022-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of exemptions from public records requirements for certain protected health information held by DOC.
Title
OGSR/Health Information/Department of Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#491 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#491 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Chapter No. 2022-87 | |
2022-05-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-02-17 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7030 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-02 | House | Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2022) |
2022-01-20 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-12-03 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-03 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7030 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7009