FL H6533 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from PCSO to compensate Jennifer Wohlgemuth for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence of PCSO employee; provides limitation on payment of compensation, fees, & costs.
Title
Relief/Jennifer Wohlgemuth/Pasco County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#107 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#107 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chapter No. 2017-228 | |
2017-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-04 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-19 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 2 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 36 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-04-05 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 |
2017-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/23/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0036 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6533 (Ch. 2017-228)