FL H6531 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from DACS & Board of Trustees of Internal Improvement Trust Fund to compensate Shuler Limited Partnership for damages sustained as result of negligence of Florida Forest Service employees & violation of ch. 590, F.S.; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Shuler Limited Partnership/Department of Agriculture & Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S34 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6531 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6531/BillText/Filed/PDF |