FL H6513 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Ricardo Medrano-Arzate & Eva Chavez-Medrano, as personal representatives of Hilda Medrano, by Okeechobee County Sheriff's Office; provides for appropriation to compensate them for damages awarded in connection with death of their daughter as a result of negligence of Okeechobee County Sheriff's Office; provides limitation on payment of fees.
Title
Relief/Ricardo Medrano-Arzate and Eva Chavez-Medrano/Okeechobee County Sheriff's Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S226 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6513 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6513/BillText/Filed/PDF |