FL H6513 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for appropriation to compensate Eric Scott Tenner's estate for injuries & damages sustained by Eric Scott Tenner & his survivors as result of negligence of employee of Miami-Dade County Board of County Commissioners; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Eric Scott Tenner/Miami-Dade County Board of County Commissioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#108 (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateCS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 2
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-17SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 24
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-17SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-16SenateReceived
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-11SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 3
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-21HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/21/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-11HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-11HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-06HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S24 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 6513

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback