FL H6507 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Scotty Bartek; provides appropriation to compensate Scotty Bartek for being wrongfully incarcerated; provides limitation on compensation & payment of attorney fees.
Title
Relief/Scotty Bartek/State of Florida
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Harding [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-22 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-09-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S78 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6507 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6507/BillText/Filed/PDF |