FL H6095 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to specified automatic restrictions on firearms & ammunition during certain declared emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrictions on Firearms and Ammunition During Emergencies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-03HouseNow in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2022-01-03HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-03HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseReferred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-12-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1528 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
870044Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback