FL H6061 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals Florida Best & Brightest Teacher Scholarship Program & Florida Best & Brightest Principal Scholarship Program.
Title
The Florida Best and Brightest Teacher and Principal Scholarship Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2508 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died, not introduced
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6061 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6061/BillText/Filed/PDF |