FL H6049 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to home protection & use of deadly force, which creates presumption of fear of death or great bodily harm in certain circumstances & provides that person has no duty to retreat & has right to stand his or her ground & meet force with force in certain circumstances.
Title
Use of Deadly Force in Defense of a Person
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-12-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1846 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6049 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6049/BillText/Filed/PDF |