FL H6047 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to charter schools capital outlay funding.
Title
Charter Schools Capital Outlay Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6047 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/6047/BillText/Filed/PDF |