FL H6035 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions allowing use or threatened use of deadly force to prevent imminent death or great bodily harm or to prevent imminent commission of forcible felony.
Title
Use or Threatened Use of Deadly Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1196 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6035 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6035/BillText/Filed/PDF |