FL H5005 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for resolution pursuant to specified instructions of collective bargaining issues at impasse between state & certified representatives of the bargaining units for state employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#774 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#429 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-19SenatePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 32 NAYS 0 1171
2020-03-19SenateConference Committee Report adopted (277655)
2020-03-19SenateConference Committee Report received
2020-03-19SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-19HousePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 104 NAYS 0
2020-03-19HouseConference Committee Report adopted (277655)
2020-03-19HouseConference Committee Report considered
2020-03-06HouseConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Cummings (Chair), Avila (At Large), Diamond (At Large), Eagle (At Large), Fitzenhagen (At Large), Jenne (At Large), La Rosa (At Large), McGhee (At Large), Rodrigues, R. (At Large), Santiago (At Large), Sprowls (At Large), Stark (At Large), Stone (At Large), Sullivan (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources/Agriculture, Environment, and General Government: Raschein (Chair), Altman, Brannan, Clemons, Jacobs, McClure, Omphroy, Perez, Polsky, Roth, Sirois, Watson, C.; Appropriations Conference Committee on Government Operations and Technology/Agriculture, Environment, and General Government: Williamson (Chair), Andrade, Antone, Brown, Cortes, Daniels, DiCeglie, Duggan, Grall, LaMarca, Sabatini, Toledo; Appropriations Conference on Health Care/Health and Human Services: Magar (Chair), Ausley, Burton, Duran, Fischer, Grant, J., Grant, M., Grieco, Jones, Pigman, Roach, Rodriguez, A.M., Rommel, Stevenson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Education: Fine (Chair), Alexander, Buchanan, Caruso, Driskell, Joseph, Maggard, Mariano, Newton, Overdorf, Ponder, Robinson, Smith, C.; Appropriations Conference Committee on Justice/Criminal and Civil Justice: Yarborough (Chair), Beltran, Byrd, Fernandez-Barquin, Gottlieb, Gregory, Payne, Plakon, Pritchett, Renner, Silvers, Slosberg; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre K-12/ Education: Latvala (Chair), Aloupis, Bush, Davis, Donalds, Hage, Killebrew, Massullo, McClain, Tomkow, Valdes, Williams, Zika; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation and Tourism/Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development: Trumbull (Chair), Drake, Daley, DuBose, Fetterhoff, Geller, Ingoglia, Leek, Plasencia, Rodriguez, A., Smith, D., Watson, B.
2020-03-06SenateConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Bradley (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Braynon (At Large), Flores (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Montford (At Large), Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Mayfield (Chair), Albritton, Bean, Benacquisto (At Large), Berman, Braynon (At Large), Broxson, Flores (At Large), Gainer, Gibson (At Large), Hooper, Hutson, Montford (At Large), Powell, Rodriguez, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large), Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Government Operations and Technology: Mayfield (Chair), Albritton, Bean, Benacquisto (At Large), Berman, Braynon (At Large), Broxson, Flores (At Large), Gainer, Gibson (At Large), Hooper, Hutson, Montford (At Large), Powell, Rodriguez, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large), Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Brandes (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Bracy, Braynon (At Large), Flores (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Gruters, Harrell, Montford (At Large), Perry, Rodriguez (At Large), Rouson, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large), Taddeo, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Stargel (Chair), Baxley, Benacquisto (At Large), Book, Cruz, Braynon (At Large), Diaz, Flores, Gibson (At Large), Montford, Pizzo, Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons, Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Stargel (Chair), Baxley, Benacquisto (At Large), Book, Cruz, Braynon (At Large), Diaz, Flores, Gibson (At Large), Montford, Pizzo, Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons, Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Book, Braynon (At Large), Diaz, Farmer, Flores, Gibson (At Large), Harrell, Hooper, Montford (At Large), Passidomo, Rader, Rodriguez (At Large), Rouson, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Tourism: Hutson (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Brandes, Braynon (At Large), Flores (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Lee, Montford (At Large), Perry, Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Simpson, Taddeo, Thurston, Torres;
2020-03-06HouseBill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations)
2020-03-06SenateBill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations)
2020-02-13HouseIn returning messages
2020-02-13SenateImmediately certified
2020-02-13SenateThe Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference
2020-02-13SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-13SenateAmendment(s) adopted (251554)
2020-02-13SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-13SenateReceived
2020-02-13SenateSubstituted for SB 2504
2020-02-13SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateIn Messages
2020-02-13HouseRequests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2020-02-13HouseImmediately certified
2020-02-13HousePassed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-02-13HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-12HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-06HouseIntroduced
2020-02-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H5001 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S2500 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2504 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5005

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback