FL H4731 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Women's Residential Treatment with Child Welfare Coordination and Medication Assisted Treatment.
Title
Women's Residential Treatment with Child Welfare Coordination and Medication Assisted Treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-28 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-16 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Filed |