FL H4631 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Australian Business Park and Southern and Northeast Industrial Area Road Project.
Title
Australian Business Park and Southern and Northeast Industrial Area Road Project
Sponsors
Rep. Al Jacquet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4631 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4631/BillText/Filed/PDF |