FL H4591 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Miami-Dade County Anti-Violence Initiative (AVI).
Title
Miami-Dade County Anti-Violence Initiative (AVI)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4591 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4591/BillText/Filed/PDF |