FL H4407 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Chattahoochee Emergency Management Building/City Hall.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chattahoochee Emergency Management Building/City Hall

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-19HouseReported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-19HouseFavorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-06HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-30HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback