FL H4207 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to prevention of recovery of damages for wrongful death by adult children of decedent or by parents of adult child with respect to claims for medical negligence; conforms provisions to changes made by act.
Title
Damages for Wrongful Death
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 141 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4207 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4207/BillText/Filed/HTML |