FL H4141 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes provisions creating & providing duties of Statewide Intermodal Transportation Advisory Council.
Title
Strategic Intermodal System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#676 (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 599 (Ch. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 833 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 833 | |
2012-02-08 | In Messages | |
2012-02-03 | Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 5 -HJ 474 | |
2012-02-03 | Read 3rd time -HJ 474 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 439 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/12 | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 248 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 248 | |
2012-01-17 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 01/19/12, 8:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-12 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 219 | |
2012-01-11 | Favorable by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 219 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 153 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 3:35 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-12-12 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 153 | |
2011-11-29 | Filed |