FL H4141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provisions which impose financial penalties, & provide calculations therefor, on school districts that do not meet maximum class size requirements.
Title
Public School Class Size Maximums
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 137 | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee -HJ 137 | |
2011-02-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0776 () 2011-04-27 - Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Budget; Rules -SJ 540
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4141 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4141/BillText/Filed/HTML |