FL H4087 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provision relating to duty of Financial Services Commission to contract for periodic report regarding actuarial peer review & analysis of ratemaking process of any licensed rating organization that makes rate filings for workers' compensation insurance.
Title
Repeal of a Workers' Compensation Independent Actuarial Peer Review Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#688 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died on Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Pending amendment(s), withdrawn (467644) -SJ 785 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Amendment(s) pending (467644) -SJ 719 | |
2012-02-29 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 719 | |
2012-02-23 | Received -SJ 679 | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 679 | |
2012-02-08 | In Messages | |
2012-02-03 | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 479 | |
2012-02-03 | Read 3rd time -HJ 479 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 442 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 151 | |
2011-12-08 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-08 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-01 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 12/08/11, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-11-16 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 174 | |
2011-11-16 | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 174 | |
2011-11-09 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 11/16/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 151 | |
2011-10-21 | Filed |