FL H4087 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Removes provisions relating to installation & use of such traffic infraction detectors to enforce specified provisions when driver fails to stop at traffic signal; removes provisions that authorize DHSMV, county, or municipality to use such detectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic Infraction Detectors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#458 (Y: 59 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#457 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-02 In Messages
2011-05-02 Read 3rd time -HJ 995
2011-04-29 Read 2nd time -HJ 952
2011-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11
2011-04-20 Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 10 -HJ 762
2011-04-18 On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/20/11, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2011-03-21 Now in Appropriations Committee -HJ 265
2011-03-18 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-17 CS by Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 8 -HJ 261
2011-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/17/11, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 135
2011-02-16 Referred to Economic Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee -HJ 135
2011-01-31 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0672 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31600831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31607456Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160776Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31664Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31665Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316650Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32150Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32227Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback