FL H4049 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to statewide toll-free school safety hotline.
Title
Statewide School Safety Hotline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in K-12 Subcommittee |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/4049 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/4049/BillText/Filed/PDF |