FL H4047 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to preemption of field of regulation of firearms & ammunition to state & providing exceptions; conforms provisions.
Title
Regulation of Firearms and Ammunition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4047 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4047/BillText/Filed/PDF |