FL H4045 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 693 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 693 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes requirement that licenses be issued in duplicate, with original delivered to licensee & copy retained by Division of Alcoholic Beverages & Tobacco of DBPR.
Title
Beverage Law
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Horner [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#654 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 693 (Ch. | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 832 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 8332 | |
2012-02-02 | In Messages | |
2012-01-25 | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 273 | |
2012-01-25 | Read 3rd time -HJ 273 | |
2012-01-24 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-01-24 | Read 2nd time -HJ 256 | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 149 | |
2011-11-15 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 173 | |
2011-11-15 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 173 | |
2011-11-08 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 11/15/11, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-10-19 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 171 | |
2011-10-19 | Favorable by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 171 | |
2011-10-12 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 10/19/11, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-10-03 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 149 | |
2011-09-21 | Filed |