FL H4041 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 2416A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Palm Beach County Fire Rescue Diesel Exhaust System Installation Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Palm Beach County Fire Rescue Diesel Exhaust System Installation Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseSee HB 5001 (line item 2416A)
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-12HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-12-11HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-12-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Meeting Cancelled
2019-12-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-19HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback