FL H4033 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 2198A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 2198A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the HART Hyperlink- Downtown Tampa Zone.
Title
HART Hyperlink- Downtown Tampa Zone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 2198A) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 2198A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4033 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4033/BillText/Filed/PDF |