FL H4015 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to medical privacy concerning firearms; deletes provisions providing that unless information is relevant to patient's medical care or safety, or safety of others, inquiries regarding firearm ownership or possession should not be made by licensed health care providers or health care facilities, that patient may decline to provide information regarding ownership or possession of firearms, clarifying that physician's authority to choose his or her patients is not altered by act, prohibiting discrimination by licensed health care providers or health care facilities based solely upon patient's firearm ownership or possession, & prohibiting harassment of patient regarding firearm ownership during an examination by licensed health care provider or health care facility.
Title
Privacy of Firearm Owners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 147 | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 147 | |
2011-08-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 338 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/4015 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/4015/BillText/Filed/HTML |