FL H4013 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Florida Renewable Fuel Standard Act.
Title
Florida Renewable Fuel Standard Act
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Rep. Marti Coley [R] | Rep. Fredrick Costello [R] | Rep. Clay Ford [R] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Rep. Clay Ingram [R] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Jimmie Smith [R] |
Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] | Rep. John Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in State Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 147 | |
2011-12-07 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 176 | |
2011-12-06 | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4 -HJ 176 | |
2011-11-29 | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 12/06/11, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 147 | |
2011-08-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
206 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
526 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/4013 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/4013/BillText/Filed/HTML |