FL H4011 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions relating to installation & use of traffic infraction detectors to enforce specified provisions when driver fails to stop at traffic signal; removes provisions that authorize DHSMV, county, or municipality to use such detectors.
Title
Traffic Infraction Detectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Favorable by Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 8 |
2013-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/14/13, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0091 (Same As) 2013-01-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0083 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 00831 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 07456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0776 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/4011 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/4011/BillText/Filed/PDF |