FL H4007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the West Palm Beach Supervisory Control and Data Acquisition (SCADA) Cybersecurity Technology Upgrades.
Title
West Palm Beach Supervisory Control and Data Acquisition (SCADA) Cybersecurity Technology Upgrades
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1635A) | |
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1635A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4007 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4007/BillText/Filed/PDF |