FL H3897 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 381M)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 381M)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Banyan Health Little Havana Crisis Intervention Receiving Facility and Health Center.
Title
Banyan Health Little Havana Crisis Intervention Receiving Facility and Health Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 381M) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-28 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-30 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-22 | House | Filed |