FL H3531 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to compensate L.T., a minor, for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence of employees of DCF; provides for waiver of specified lien interests held by state; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/L.T./DCF
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0026 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/3531 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/3531/BillText/Filed/PDF |