FL H3529 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for appropriation to compensate Carl Abbott for injuries sustained as result of negligence of Palm Beach County School District; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Carl Abbott/Palm Beach County School District
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Raburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#731 (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 6 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-25 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/25/14, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-17 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0056 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary