FL H3527 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to compensate Asia Rollins for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence of Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County, d/b/a Jackson Memorial Hospital; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Asia Rollins/Public Health Trust of Miami-Dade County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#291 (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#291 (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Chapter No. 2015-213 | |
2015-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 34 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2015-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 105 NAYS 9 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-04-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-07 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/07/15, 4:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0034 (Similar To) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3527 (Ch. 2015-213)