FL H3525 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Preventing Opioid and General Substance Abuse-Based Child Removals.
Title
Preventing Opioid and General Substance Abuse-Based Child Removals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/19, 11:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3525 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3525/BillText/Filed/PDF |