FL H3523 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for appropriation to compensate them for injuries sustained by Mark T. Sawicki as result of negligence of employee of City of Tallahassee; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs; provides that certain payments & appropriation satisfy all present & future claims related to negligent act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Mark T. Sawicki & Sharon L. Sawicki/City of Tallahassee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#290 (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-212
2015-06-11 Approved by Governor
2015-06-01 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-28HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-28SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2
2015-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted for SB 54
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-27SenateWithdrawn from Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 9
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-09HouseReferred to- Calendar
2015-04-09HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee
2015-04-08HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-04-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-07HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/07/15, 4:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-18HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-02-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0054 (Same As) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3523 (Ch. 2015-212)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback