FL H3521 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from General Revenue Fund to compensate J.D.S. for injuries & damages sustained as result of negligence by APD; provides that certain payments & appropriation satisfy all present & future claims related to negligent act; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/J.D.S./Agency for Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-12-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0038 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/3521 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/3521/BillText/Filed/PDF |