FL H3375 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Pompano Beach Septic to Sewer Conversion.
Title
Pompano Beach Septic to Sewer Conversion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/23/20, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3375 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3375/BillText/Filed/PDF |