FL H3275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Hospital Outpatient Services Cancer Center Prospective Payment System Exemption.
Title
Hospital Outpatient Services Cancer Center Prospective Payment System Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. James Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-21 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3275 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3275/BillText/Filed/PDF |