FL H2893 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 248)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 248)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Easterseals of Brevard and Collier Counties Life Skills & Employment Readiness Programs.
Title
Easterseals of Brevard and Collier Counties Life Skills & Employment Readiness Programs
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 248) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2893 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2893/BillText/Filed/PDF |