FL H2891 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Substance Use Disorder Residential Treatment Services for Women and Children.
Title
Substance Use Disorder Residential Treatment Services for Women and Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-02-09 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |