FL H2691 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Prek-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 20 @ 1:00 pm House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Near Peer Coaching for Post-Secondary Success.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Near Peer Coaching for Post-Secondary Success

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseAdded to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-18HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-18HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-18HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback