FL H2689 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Seminole County Public Schools Construction Workforce Pipeline Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seminole County Public Schools Construction Workforce Pipeline Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
2020-03-19HouseSee HB 5001 (line item 114)
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-10HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-12-09HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-12-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/09/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-11-13HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-05HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback