FL H2561 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Orange County Public Schools (OCPS) Calculus Project and Starbase Mentoring and Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics (STEM).
Title
Orange County Public Schools (OCPS) Calculus Project and Starbase Mentoring and Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics (STEM)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114) | |
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 114) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-09 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/09/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-01 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2561 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2561/BillText/Filed/PDF |