FL H2453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 166A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 166A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Washington Intern Study Experience.
Title
Washington Intern Study Experience
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 166A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2453 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/2453/BillText/Filed/PDF |