FL H2443 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1234)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1234)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Police Athletic-Activities Leagues Youth Directors & Life After High School Programs.
Title
Police Athletic-Activities Leagues Youth Directors & Life After High School Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1234) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1234) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2443 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2443/BillText/Filed/PDF |