FL H2413 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Medley 96th Street Drainage Improvements (NW 87th Avenue to NW South River Drive).
Title
Medley 96th Street Drainage Improvements (NW 87th Avenue to NW South River Drive)
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-09 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2413 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/2413/BillText/Filed/PDF |